OR HB3701 | 2010 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Chapter 80, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 18, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to open burning in Linn County; and declaring an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to open burning in Linn County; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-18 Chapter 80, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 18, 2010.
2010-03-18 Governor signed.
2010-02-24 President signed.
2010-02-24 Speaker signed.
2010-02-20 Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Nelson.
2010-02-19 Second reading.
2010-02-19 Recommendation: Do pass.
2010-02-18 Public Hearing and Work Session held.
2010-02-17 Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
2010-02-17 First reading. Referred to President's desk.
2010-02-16 Third reading. Carried by Thompson. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Boone, Kennemer, Thatcher.
2010-02-15 Second reading.
2010-02-12 Recommendation: Do pass.
2010-02-11 Work Session held.
2010-02-09 Public Hearing and Work Session held.
2010-02-04 Referred to Environment and Water.
2010-02-04 First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback