OR HB3700 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Chapter 101, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 29, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Chapter 101, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 29, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public funds; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to public funds; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Chapter 101, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 29, 2010. | |
2010-03-29 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-25 | President signed. | |
2010-02-25 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-23 | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 44; Nays, 12--Berger, Bruun, Cameron, Freeman, Garrard, Gilman, Hanna, Jenson, Kennemer, Olson, Whisnant, Wingard; Excused, 4--Frederick, Kahl, Schaufler, Tomei. | |
2010-02-23 | Vote explanation(s) filed by Verger. | |
2010-02-23 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Metsger. Passed. Ayes, 24; nays, 6--Bates, Johnson, Kruse, Nelson, Verger, Whitsett. | |
2010-02-23 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | (Amendments distributed.) | |
2010-02-23 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) | |
2010-02-22 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-20 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-19 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-19 | Referred to Rules by order of the President. | |
2010-02-19 | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. | |
2010-02-18 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Business and Transportation. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2010-02-16 | Vote explanation(s) filed by Gilliam. | |
2010-02-15 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Bailey, Beyer, Hanna. | |
2010-02-15 | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 44; Nays, 13--Berger, Bruun, Cameron, Freeman, Gilman, Hanna, Maurer, Olson, Schaufler, Smith G., Weidner, Whisnant, Wingard; Absent, 1--Jenson; Excused, 2--Garrett, Kennemer. | |
2010-02-12 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-11 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-10 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-08 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-02-04 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |