OR HB3686 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Chapter 105, (2010 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Chapter 105, (2010 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to unlawful discrimination in employment practices; and prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to unlawful discrimination in employment practices; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Chapter 105, (2010 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2011. | |
2010-04-01 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-25 | President signed. | |
2010-02-25 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-23 | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 48; Nays, 7--Barker, Freeman, Gilman, Maurer, Nolan, Olson, Witt; Absent, 1--Harker; Excused, 4--Frederick, Kahl, Schaufler, Tomei. | |
2010-02-23 | Vote explanation(s) filed by Prozanski, Verger. | |
2010-02-23 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Atkinson. Passed. Ayes, 21; nays, 9--Bonamici, Burdick, Johnson, Kruse, Metsger, Nelson, Prozanski, Verger, Whitsett. | |
2010-02-22 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-22 | (Amendments distributed.) | |
2010-02-22 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) | |
2010-02-20 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-18 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-15 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-02-11 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2010-02-10 | Vote explanation(s) filed by Harker. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading. Carried by Speaker Hunt. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 8--Barker, Freeman, Gilman, Harker, Maurer, Nolan, Olson, Witt; Absent, 1--Tomei. | |
2010-02-09 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-08 | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of Speaker. | |
2010-02-08 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. | |
2010-02-05 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |