OR HB3682 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - Motion to postpone indefinitely carried. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Morrisette.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - Motion to postpone indefinitely carried. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Morrisette.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to smokeless tobacco products; prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to smokeless tobacco products; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | Motion to postpone indefinitely carried. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Morrisette. | |
2010-02-22 | Taken from 02-23 calendar in order to take final action carried by unanimous consent. | |
2010-02-22 | Taken from 02-22 Calendar and placed on 02-23 Calendar on voice vote. | |
2010-02-20 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-20 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2010-02-18 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-12 | Referred to Finance and Revenue. | |
2010-02-11 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 33; Nays, 27--Bentz, Berger, Bruun, Cameron, Esquivel, Freeman, Garrard, Gilliam, Gilman, Hanna, Huffman, Jenson, Kennemer, Krieger, Matthews, Maurer, Olson, Richardson, Schaufler, Smith G., Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Wingard, Witt. | |
2010-02-09 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-08 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-05 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-03 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Revenue. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |