OR HB3681 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to tax credits; prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to tax credits; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2010-02-20 | Referred to Finance and Revenue. | |
2010-02-19 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2010-02-19 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Bailey. | |
2010-02-19 | Third reading. Carried by Barnhart. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner. | |
2010-02-18 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-17 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-16 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-15 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-12 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-10 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-09 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-03 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Revenue. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |