OR HB3680 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Chapter 76, (2010 Laws): Effective date May 27, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Chapter 76, (2010 Laws): Effective date May 27, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to tax credits; prescribing an effective date; and providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.
Title
Relating to tax credits; prescribing an effective date; and providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Chapter 76, (2010 Laws): Effective date May 27, 2010. | |
2010-03-18 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-25 | President signed. | |
2010-02-25 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-23 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Bailey, Bentz, Smith G. | |
2010-02-23 | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Kahl, Schaufler. | |
2010-02-22 | Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Morrisette. | |
2010-02-20 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-19 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) | |
2010-02-19 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-17 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-12 | Referred to Finance and Revenue. | |
2010-02-11 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2010-02-10 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Bailey, Bentz, Cameron, Smith G.. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading. Carried by Barnhart. Passed. Ayes, 59; Nays, 1--Gilman. | |
2010-02-09 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-08 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-05 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-03 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Revenue. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |