OR HB3673 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Chapter 52, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 10, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Chapter 52, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 10, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to landowner liability; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to landowner liability; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Chapter 52, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 10, 2010. | |
2010-03-10 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-24 | President signed. | |
2010-02-24 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-20 | Third reading. Carried by Dingfelder. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Nelson. | |
2010-02-19 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-19 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2010-02-18 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2010-02-17 | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 60. | |
2010-02-16 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-16 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-16 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-15 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |