OR HB3665 | 2010 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Chapter 74, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 18, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to dental services contracts; and declaring an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to dental services contracts; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-18 Chapter 74, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 18, 2010.
2010-03-18 Governor signed.
2010-02-25 President signed.
2010-02-25 Speaker signed.
2010-02-23 Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Hanna.
2010-02-23 House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Kahl, Schaufler.
2010-02-22 Girod declared potential conflict of interest.
2010-02-22 Third reading. Carried by Morse. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Morrisette, Rosenbaum.
2010-02-20 Second reading.
2010-02-19 Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2010-02-18 Work Session held.
2010-02-16 Public Hearing held.
2010-02-11 Referred to Health Care.
2010-02-10 First reading. Referred to President's desk.
2010-02-09 Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Hanna, Schaufler.
2010-02-09 Third reading. Carried by Maurer. Passed. Ayes, 58; Absent, 1--Jenson; Excused, 1--Clem.
2010-02-08 Second reading.
2010-02-05 Recommendation: Do pass.
2010-02-04 Public Hearing and Work Session held.
2010-02-02 Referred to Health Care.
2010-02-01 First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback