OR HB3660 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to confined animal feeding operations; declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to confined animal feeding operations; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Rep. Vic Gilliam [R] | Sen. Fred Girod [R] | Rep. Betty Komp [D] |
Rep. Mike McLane [R] | Rep. Jim Weidner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-05-23 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-05-10 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-05-05 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.or.us/searchmeas.html |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/11reg/measures/hb3600.dir/hb3660.intro.html |