OR HB3655 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Chapter 6, (2010 Laws): Effective date February 25, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Chapter 6, (2010 Laws): Effective date February 25, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to payment of unemployment insurance benefit extensions; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to payment of unemployment insurance benefit extensions; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Chapter 6, (2010 Laws): Effective date February 25, 2010. | |
2010-02-25 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-24 | President signed. | |
2010-02-24 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-19 | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2010-02-18 | Carried over to 02-19 by unanimous consent. | |
2010-02-17 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-17 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2010-02-15 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Commerce and Workforce Developmemt. | |
2010-02-05 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2010-02-04 | Third reading. Carried by Schaufler. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Hoyle, Read. | |
2010-02-03 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-03 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2010-02-03 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Business and Labor. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |