OR HB3654 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Chapter 46, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 10, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Chapter 46, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 10, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to mortgage insurance limitation; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to mortgage insurance limitation; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Chapter 46, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 10, 2010. | |
2010-03-10 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-24 | President signed. | |
2010-02-24 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-19 | Third reading. Carried by George. Passed. Ayes, 24; nays, 6--Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Shields, Whitsett, Winters. | |
2010-02-19 | Motion to refer to Rules failed. Ayes, 12; nays, 18--Bates, Bonamici, Burdick, Devlin, Dingfelder, Edwards, Hass, Johnson, Metsger, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Morrisette, Prozanski, Rosenbaum, Schrader, Shields, Verger, President Courtney. | |
2010-02-18 | Carried over to 02-19 by unanimous consent. | |
2010-02-17 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-17 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2010-02-16 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-12 | Referred to Consumer Protection and Public Affairs. | |
2010-02-11 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading. Carried by Barton. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Hunt. | |
2010-02-09 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-08 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-05 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-03 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Business and Labor. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |