OR HB3653 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to mandatory workplace communications to employee about employer's opinions; declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to mandatory workplace communications to employee about employer's opinions; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed. Ayes, 34; Nays, 26--Bentz, Berger, Bruun, Cameron, Esquivel, Freeman, Garrard, Gilliam, Gilman, Hanna, Huffman, Jenson, Kennemer, Komp, Krieger, Maurer, Olson, Richardson, Smith G., Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, VanOrman, Weidner, Whisnant, Wingard. | |
2010-02-12 | Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 36--Bailey, Barker, Barnhart, Barton, Beyer, Boone, Buckley, Cannon, Clem, Cowan, Dembrow, Doherty, Edwards, Frederick, Garrett, Gelser, Greenlick, Harker, Holvey, Hoyle, Kahl, Komp, Kotek, Matthews, Nathanson, Nolan, Read, Riley, Roblan, Schaufler, Smith J., Stiegler, Tomei, VanOrman, Witt, Speaker Hunt. | |
2010-02-11 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-10 | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-10 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-05 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Business and Labor. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |