OR HB3630 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Chapter 562, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 31, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs State Department of Energy to establish program to provide assistance related to energy projects and activities to environmental justice communities. Directs State Department of Energy to establish program to provide assistance related to energy projects and activities to environmental justice communities. Requires State Department of Energy to develop comprehensive state energy strategy that identifies optimized pathways to achieving state's energy policy objectives. Requires department to periodically update state energy strategy. Directs department to produce report regarding state energy strategy and submit report to Governor and appropriate interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than November 1, 2025. Permits county to develop and adopt energy resilience plan and incorporate energy resilience plan into county's applicable natural hazard mitigation plan. Requires public utilities to use reasonable efforts to assist with and comply with requests from county for information regarding energy infrastructure, provided information is exempt from disclosure requirements. Directs State Department of Energy to establish program to award grants to counties to cover costs of developing energy resilience plans that meet certain requirements. Sunsets grant program on January 2, 2026. Requires State Department of Energy, in consultation with Housing and Community Services Department, to establish whole-home energy savings program and high-efficiency electric home rebate program. Requires State Department of Energy to create single resource that provides to interested persons information, technical assistance and assistance identifying contractors and financing options, related to available energy efficiency incentives and programs. Requires department to coordinate information and data exchanges between certain entities. Requires entities to use best practices to maintain confidentiality and security of information and data as required by law. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to State Department of Energy for energy development services and certain expenses. Increases limit on biennial expenditures by State Department of Energy from federal funds. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to energy; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-15HouseChapter 562, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 31, 2023.
2023-07-31HouseGovernor signed.
2023-06-27SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-24SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Findley.
2023-06-24SenateThird reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 7--Anderson, Bonham, Findley, Girod, Robinson, Smith DB, Weber; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Thatcher.
2023-06-23SenateCarried over to 06-24 by unanimous consent.
2023-06-22SenateCarried over to 06-23 by unanimous consent.
2023-06-21SenateSecond reading.
2023-06-21SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2023-06-16SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2023-06-15SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2023-06-14HouseThird reading. Carried by Pham K. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 21--Boice, Boshart Davis, Cate, Conrad, Cramer, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Levy B, Lewis, Mannix, McIntire, Morgan, Osborne, Reschke, Scharf, Smith G, Stout, Wallan, Wright; Excused, 2--Bynum, Tran; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Breese-Iverson.
2023-06-13HouseSecond reading.
2023-06-12HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2023-06-09HouseWork Session held.
2023-06-07HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2023-06-07HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2023-05-31HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
2023-05-25HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2023-05-25HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB3630
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3630/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3630/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3630/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3630/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25305
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25378
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80011
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80292
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275686
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275811
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80360
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275919
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80436
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275943
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80450
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80654
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80711
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36054
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=585813
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=590171

Bill Comments

feedback