OR HB3627 | 2010 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Chapter 66, (2010 Laws): Effective date May 27, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to subtraction for investment of severance pay in small business; and prescribing an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to subtraction for investment of severance pay in small business; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-18 Chapter 66, (2010 Laws): Effective date May 27, 2010.
2010-03-18 Governor signed.
2010-02-24 President signed.
2010-02-24 Speaker signed.
2010-02-22 Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Morrisette, Rosenbaum.
2010-02-20 Second reading.
2010-02-20 Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2010-02-19 Public Hearing and Work Session held.
2010-02-17 Referred to Finance and Revenue.
2010-02-17 First reading. Referred to President's desk.
2010-02-17 Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Dembrow; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Hunt.
2010-02-16 Second reading.
2010-02-15 Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2010-02-12 Work Session held.
2010-02-05 Public Hearing held.
2010-02-01 Referred to Revenue.
2010-02-01 First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback