OR HB3626 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Chapter 561, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Extends safe surrender period for anonymously leaving infant at authorized facility to 60 days from infant's date of birth. Extends safe surrender period for anonymously leaving infant at authorized facility to 60 days from infant's date of birth. Directs authorized facility to post and maintain signs informing public of authorized facilities and safe surrender provisions. Directs Department of Human Services to design signs that must be posted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to anonymous surrenders of infants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-15HouseChapter 561, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
2023-07-31HouseGovernor signed.
2023-06-27SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-23SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Anderson.
2023-06-23SenateThird reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 24; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher.
2023-06-22SenateCarried over to 06-23 by unanimous consent.
2023-06-21SenateCarried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent.
2023-06-20SenateSecond reading.
2023-06-20SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-06-16SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2023-06-16SenateReferred to Rules.
2023-06-15SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2023-06-08HouseThird reading. Carried by Cate. Passed. Ayes, 50; Excused, 4--Levy B, McIntire, Morgan, Owens; Excused for Business of the House, 6--Holvey, Levy E, Nguyen D, Pham K, Ruiz, Sanchez.
2023-06-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2023 Calendar.
2023-06-07HouseSecond reading.
2023-06-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-06-01HouseWork Session held.
2023-05-25HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-05-22HouseReferred to Rules.
2023-05-16HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB3626
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3626/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3626/Enrolled
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79560
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274666
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274889
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80048
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275182
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80100
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80137
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276111
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276112
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276115
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80553
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276142
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35976
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=585211
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36136
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=589618

Bill Comments

feedback