OR HB3626 | 2010 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Chapter 88, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 23, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to vision screenings; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to vision screenings; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-23 Chapter 88, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 23, 2010.
2010-03-23 Governor signed.
2010-02-25 President signed.
2010-02-25 Speaker signed.
2010-02-23 Telfer declared potential conflict of interest.
2010-02-23 Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 30.
2010-02-23 Second reading.
2010-02-23 Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2010-02-23 Referred to Ways and Means.
2010-02-23 First reading. Referred to President's desk.
2010-02-23 Third reading. Carried by Kotek. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Gilman; Excused, 2--Kahl, Schaufler.
2010-02-22 Second reading.
2010-02-19 Recommendation: Do pass.
2010-02-18 Work Session held.
2010-02-05 Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2010-02-05 Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2010-02-04 Work Session held.
2010-02-03 Public Hearing held.
2010-02-01 Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2010-02-01 First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback