OR HB3625 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Chapter 349, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Chapter 349, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Withdraws all applications for amendment convention under Article V of United States Constitution that were previously made by Legislative Assembly and declares these applications null and void. Withdraws all applications for amendment convention under Article V of United States Constitution that were previously made by Legislative Assembly and declares these applications null and void. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to applications of the Legislative Assembly for amendment conventions under Article V of the United States Constitution; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | House | Chapter 349, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023. |
2023-07-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Findley. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 25; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Thatcher. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Carried over to 06-24 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-06-08 | House | Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed. Ayes, 33; Nays, 16--Boice, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Cramer, Diehl, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Javadi, Lewis, Osborne, Scharf, Stout, Wright; Excused, 4--Levy B, McIntire, Morgan, Owens; Excused for Business of the House, 7--Holvey, Levy E, Nguyen D, Pham K, Reschke, Ruiz, Sanchez. |
2023-06-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-06-07 | House | Second reading. |
2023-06-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-06-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-05-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-05-15 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2023-05-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |