OR HB3623 | 2010 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Chapter 65, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 18, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to human trafficking information; and declaring an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to human trafficking information; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-18 Chapter 65, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 18, 2010.
2010-03-18 Governor signed.
2010-02-23 President signed.
2010-02-23 Speaker signed.
2010-02-19 Third reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Passed. Ayes, 30.
2010-02-18 Carried over to 02-19 by unanimous consent.
2010-02-17 Second reading.
2010-02-17 Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2010-02-16 Public Hearing and Work Session held.
2010-02-11 Referred to Human Services and Rural Health Policy.
2010-02-10 First reading. Referred to President's desk.
2010-02-09 Third reading. Carried by Barton. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Clem.
2010-02-08 Second reading.
2010-02-05 Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2010-02-05 Work Session held.
2010-02-03 Public Hearing and Work Session held.
2010-02-01 Referred to Human Services.
2010-02-01 First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback