OR HB3618 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Chapter 100, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 29, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Chapter 100, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 29, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to home care workers; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to home care workers; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Chapter 100, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 29, 2010. | |
2010-03-29 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-25 | President signed. | |
2010-02-25 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-23 | Edwards declared potential conflict of interest. | |
2010-02-23 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Shields. Passed. Ayes, 20; nays, 10--Atkinson, Boquist, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Kruse, Morse, Starr, Telfer, Whitsett. | |
2010-02-23 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2010-02-23 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2010-02-23 | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 34; Nays, 24--Bentz, Berger, Bruun, Cameron, Esquivel, Freeman, Garrard, Gilliam, Gilman, Hanna, Huffman, Jenson, Kennemer, Krieger, Maurer, Olson, Richardson, Smith G., Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Wingard; Excused, 2--Kahl, Schaufler. | |
2010-02-22 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-19 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-18 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2010-02-09 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2010-02-08 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-05 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Human Services with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |