OR HB3612 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Chapter 36, (2010 Laws): Effective date May 27, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Chapter 36, (2010 Laws): Effective date May 27, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to additional property taxes; and prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to additional property taxes; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Chapter 36, (2010 Laws): Effective date May 27, 2010. | |
2010-03-10 | Filed with Secretary of State without Governor's signature. | |
2010-02-24 | President signed. | |
2010-02-24 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-22 | Third reading. Carried by Telfer. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Morrisette, Rosenbaum. | |
2010-02-20 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-20 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2010-02-19 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Finance and Revenue. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2010-02-17 | Third reading. Carried by Buckley. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Hunt. | |
2010-02-16 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-15 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-12 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-10 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-09 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Revenue. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |