OR HB3610 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-24 - Chapter 264, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-24 - Chapter 264, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Alcohol Pricing and Addiction Services. Establishes Task Force on Alcohol Pricing and Addiction Services. Directs task force to study issues related to alcohol addiction in this state. Directs task force to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health not later than September 15, 2024. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to alcohol; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-24 | House | Chapter 264, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023. |
2023-07-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Findley. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 8--Anderson, Bonham, Findley, Girod, Knopp, Robinson, Smith DB, Weber; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Thatcher. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Carried over to 06-24 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Carried over to 06-23 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-06-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 19--Boice, Boshart Davis, Cate, Conrad, Cramer, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Javadi, Lewis, Mannix, McIntire, Morgan, Osborne, Reschke, Scharf, Stout, Wallan, Wright; Excused, 2--Bynum, Tran; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Breese-Iverson. |
2023-06-13 | House | Second reading. |
2023-06-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-06-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-06-05 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2023-06-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-05-25 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2023-05-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2023-05-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-05-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-04-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-13 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2023-04-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |