OR HB3609 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Chapter 39, (2010 Laws): Effective date May 27, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Chapter 39, (2010 Laws): Effective date May 27, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to enterprise zones; and prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to enterprise zones; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Chapter 39, (2010 Laws): Effective date May 27, 2010. | |
2010-03-10 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-25 | President signed. | |
2010-02-25 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-23 | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Kahl, Schaufler. | |
2010-02-22 | Boquist declared potential conflict of interest. | |
2010-02-22 | Third reading. Carried by Morse. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 1--Boquist; excused, 2--Morrisette, Rosenbaum. | |
2010-02-20 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-19 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2010-02-19 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Finance and Revenue. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2010-02-17 | Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Hunt. | |
2010-02-16 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-15 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2010-02-09 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-05 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Revenue. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |