OR HB3608 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that, for purpose of specifying prevailing rate of wage for electrical workers, locality is geographical area within which each local union is exclusive representative for local union's membership, and collective bargaining agreement is collective bargaining agreement to which local union is party. Provides that, for purpose of specifying prevailing rate of wage for electrical workers, locality is geographical area within which each local union is exclusive representative for local union's membership, and collective bargaining agreement is collective bargaining agreement to which local union is party. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a prevailing rate of wage for electrical workers; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-04-20HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-04-07HouseReferred to Rules.
2023-04-06HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB3608
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3608/Introduced
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77988
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271137
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271268
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79132
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273331
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79137
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273612

Bill Comments

feedback