OR HB3592 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires general hospital licensed in Oregon to provide maternity services subject to exemption that Oregon Health Authority may allow under criteria prescribed by rule. Requires general hospital licensed in Oregon to provide maternity services subject to exemption that Oregon Health Authority may allow under criteria prescribed by rule. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to maternity services; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Zach Hudson [D] | Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] | Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] | Rep. Jeff Helfrich [R] |
Rep. Travis Nelson [D] | Rep. Thuy Tran [D] | Sen. Deb Patterson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2023-03-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |