OR HB3579 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Oregon Department of Administrative Services to adopt rules to govern procurements of clean energy technology. Requires Oregon Department of Administrative Services to adopt rules to govern procurements of clean energy technology. Directs department to cooperate with state agencies with expertise in energy production and conservation and in reducing or mitigating environmental impacts. Specifies required contents of rules. Directs other state agencies to cooperate with department in adopting and implementing rules. Permits department to enter into cooperative procurements and intergovernmental agreements to procure clean energy technology in combination with other governmental bodies in this state, State of Washington and Province of British Columbia to provide incentive for clean energy technology manufacturers and suppliers to create and retain high-skilled manufacturing jobs. Establishes Task Force on Establishing, Attracting and Supporting Regional] Sustaining Manufacturing of Clean Energy Technology. Specifies task force membership and requires task force to study and recommend methods to attract and foster manufacturing firms and operations to this state, with emphasis on using public procurements of clean energy technology to create market and to give incentives to prospective contractors to create and retain high-skill jobs] of attracting, fostering and sustaining manufacturing firms and operations in this state, while maximizing additional benefits, including creating and sustaining living wage or union jobs, alleviating supply chain constraints and improving access to clean energy technologies, supporting technological innovation and diversifying economy of this state. Creates income and corporate excise tax credit for advanced manufacturing production, calculated as percentage of corresponding federal income tax credit.] Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2024, and before January 1, 2030.] Establishes Oregon Clean Energy Technology Manufacturing Opportunity Fund and appropriates moneys in fund to Oregon Business Development Department. Permits department to make expenditures from fund to foster, attract and sustain clean energy technology industries, early-stage companies that can grow into manufacturing operations and for other purposes, including making grants to certified community development financial institution for allocation to nonprofit organizations that promote clean energy technology manufacturing. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to energy technology; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-04-10HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2023-04-10HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2023-04-03HouseWork Session held.
2023-03-29HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-03-10HouseReferred to Climate, Energy, and Environment.
2023-03-07HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB3579
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3579/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3579/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3579/A-Engrossed
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23911
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23916
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24264
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77392
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75196
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268455
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268047
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269624
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269623
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269328
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77424
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77761
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78477
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35066

Bill Comments

feedback