OR HB3556 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Transportation to study issues related to abandoned recreational vehicles. Requires Department of Transportation to study issues related to abandoned recreational vehicles. Directs department to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to transportation not later than September 15, 2024. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to abandoned recreational vehicles; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Rep. Court Boice [R] | Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] |
Rep. David Gomberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2023-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |