OR HB3548 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits receiving compensation for collecting and returning ballots and assisting electors if compensation is based on number of ballots collected and returned or number of electors assisted. Punishes by maximum of one year's imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both.
Title
Relating to elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Cliff Bentz [R] | Rep. Gregory Barreto [R] | Rep. Knute Buehler [R] | Rep. John Davis [R] |
Rep. Sal Esquivel [R] | Rep. Jodi Hack [R] | Sen. Bill Kennemer [R] | Rep. Wayne Krieger [R] |
Rep. Mike McLane [R] | Rep. Mike Nearman [R] | Rep. Andy Olson [R] | Rep. Bill Post [R] |
Rep. Sherrie Sprenger [R] | Rep. Duane Stark [R] | Rep. Jim Weidner [R] | Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] |
Rep. Gail Whitsett [R] | Rep. Carl Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 27 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-06-29 | House | Motion to withdraw from Rules failed.Ayes, 27; Nays, 30--Barker, Barnhart, Barton, Boone, Buckley, Clem, Doherty, Fagan, Frederick, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lininger, Lively, McKeown, Nathanson, Nosse, Rayfield, Read, Reardon, Smith Warner, Taylor, Vega Pederson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 3--Gallegos, Hack, Weidner. |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2015-04-30 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |