OR HB3537 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-29 - Chapter 702, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-29 - Chapter 702, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permits elector to simultaneously run as candidate for more than one district office.
Title
Relating to candidates for election.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Kennemer [R] | Rep. Brent Barton [D] | Rep. John Davis [R] | Sen. Shemia Fagan [D] |
Rep. Christopher Garrett [D] | Rep. Vic Gilliam [R] | Rep. Julie Parrish [R] | Rep. Carolyn Tomei [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-29 | House | Chapter 702, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014. |
2013-07-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Starr. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Dingfelder, Edwards. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2013-06-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 4--Freeman, Hanna, Thatcher, Whitsett; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Fagan. |
2013-06-19 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-06-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-06-05 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-06-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |