OR HB3529 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs road authority to dispose of any dead animal carcass that road authority finds on its highways that are located in areas of known wolf activity.
Title
Relating to wolves.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-05-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-15 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-05-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |