OR HB3522 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Chapter 640, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Chapter 640, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that Environmental Quality Commission may increase water quality permit fees by greater amount than provided for in statute if greater amount is provided for in Department of Environmental Quality's legislatively approved budget. Specifies that Environmental Quality Commission may increase water quality permit fees by greater amount than provided for in statute if greater amount is legislatively approved] provided for in Department of Environmental Quality's legislatively approved budget.
Title
Relating to water quality permit fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-08 | House | Chapter 640, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016. |
2015-07-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 19; nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 2--Gelser, Thatcher. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Carried over to 06-18 by unanimous consent. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed.Ayes, 31; Nays, 23--Barreto, Buehler, Evans, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Parrish, Post, Smith, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 2--Barker, Esquivel; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Bentz, Davis, McKeown, Vega Pederson. |
2015-06-09 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-05-20 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-05-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-05-08 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2015-04-20 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-04-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-04-16 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-04-08 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2015-04-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |