OR HB3509 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes counties to regulate location of sex offender treatment facilities.
Title
Relating to sex offender treatment; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jessica Pederson [D] | Sen. Shemia Fagan [D] | Rep. Joe Gallegos [D] | Rep. Jeff Barker [D] |
Rep. Deborah Boone [D] | Rep. Christopher Garrett [D] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] | Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-05-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-04-16 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |