OR HB3506 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 755, (2013 Laws): Effective date October 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Task Force on Minority Language Voting Materials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to bilingual election requirements; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-14HouseChapter 755, (2013 Laws): Effective date October 7, 2013.
2013-08-14HouseGovernor signed.
2013-07-06SenatePresident signed.
2013-07-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2013-07-01SenateThird reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 16; nays, 14--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Starr, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters.
2013-06-29SenateSecond reading.
2013-06-29SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2013-06-27SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2013-06-27SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2013-06-27HouseThird reading. Carried by Gallegos. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 24--Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Smith.
2013-06-26HouseSecond reading.
2013-06-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2013-06-25HouseWork Session held.
2013-06-18HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2013-06-18HouseWork Session held.
2013-06-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2013-06-10HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
2013-06-04HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2013-06-04HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2013-05-29HouseWork Session held.
2013-05-01HousePublic Hearing held.
2013-04-18HouseReferred to Rules with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2013-04-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback