OR HB3501 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Oregon Right to Rest Act. Establishes Oregon Right to Rest Act. Makes violation unlawful practice enforceable by Commissioner of Bureau of Labor and Industries or by civil action. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to rights of persons experiencing homelessness; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-05-04 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Housing and Homelessness. |
2023-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |