OR HB3500 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Expanding Access to More Voters in Primary Elections to conduct analysis and determine best method or methods to expand access to more electors in primary elections in Oregon. Provides primary ballot of all major parties to nonaffiliated electors.] Permits nonaffiliated elector to vote in primary election of major political party by submitting form stating elector's intent to become affiliated with party and by returning form with completed primary ballot.] Requires task force to submit report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly by December 31, 2015. Sunsets task force on December 31, 2016. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to elector affiliation with political parties; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Val Hoyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-06-18 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-11 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2015-05-28 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-05-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-25 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2015-03-20 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2015-03-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |