OR HB3490 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes state policy regarding natural climate solutions. Establishes state policy regarding natural climate solutions. Establishes Natural and Working Lands Fund and provides for transfer of moneys from fund to certain state agencies. Prescribes uses of moneys from fund and requires Oregon Global Warming Commission to report to legislature on uses of moneys from fund. Directs State Department of Energy and commission to prepare baseline, activity-based metrics and community impact metrics for net biological carbon sequestration in natural and working lands and establish biological carbon sequestration goals. Directs State Department of Energy, in coordination with commission, to study workforce training programs needed to support adoption of natural climate solutions and provide results to committees of Legislative Assembly related to environment no later than September 15, 2024. Authorizes commission to appoint natural and working lands advisory committee. Directs State Department of Agriculture to establish competitive grant program for equipment to support soil health practices. Requires use of wood products certified by Forest Stewardship Council in public improvement contract for construction or renovation of public building. Requires Department of State Lands to require managed grazing techniques in lease of common school grazing lands on or after effective date of Act. Directs State Forester to consider impact of climate change in determinations of greatest permanent value of managed forest lands. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die. .

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to natural climate solutions; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-03-03HouseReferred to Climate, Energy, and Environment.
2023-02-28HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback