OR HB3487 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Housing and Community Services Department to report to Legislative Assembly on homeownership disparities by September 15 of each even-numbered year. Requires Housing and Community Services Department to report to Legislative Assembly on homeownership disparities by September 15 of each even-numbered year. Sunsets January 2, 2035. Requires department to identify and remove barriers to down payment assistance for individuals with individual taxpayer identification numbers and to report to Oregon Housing Stability Council. Requires department to convene and provide training programs for homeownership organizations and to evaluate and report on effectiveness of organization's programs to council. Requires department to research existing financial literacy materials and to develop new materials and financial literacy pamphlet by September 15, 2025. Requires mortgage bankers and brokers to include financial literacy pamphlet with mortgages. Becomes operative January 1, 2026. .

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to homeownership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-04-04HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2023-04-04HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means.
2023-03-30HouseWork Session held.
2023-03-16HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-03-03HouseReferred to Housing and Homelessness.
2023-02-28HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB3487
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3487/Introduced
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76887
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74865
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76826
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77259
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265296
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265055
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268462
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268460
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268461
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34940

Bill Comments

feedback