OR HB3483 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds secular organizations and members and former members of Legislative Assembly to list of persons and entities authorized to solemnize marriages. Adds secular organizations and parties to marriage] members and former members of Legislative Assembly to list of persons and entities authorized to solemnize marriages.
Title
Relating to solemnization of marriage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-05-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed.Ayes, 35; Nays, 23--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Post, Smith, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 2--Evans, Sprenger. |
2015-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 19, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-14 | House | Second reading. |
2015-05-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-05-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-05-04 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2015-04-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2015-03-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |