OR HB3473 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Oregon Health Authority to establish and maintain list of designated high priority chemicals of concern for children's health used in children's products and to periodically review and revise list. Requires authority to post certain information on authority's website. Requires manufacturers of certain children's products to provide notice to authority regarding chemicals on list. Requires certain manufacturers to take additional actions after certain dates to comply with notice requirement. Allows authority to enter into certain data sharing agreements with other states. Allows authority to participate in Interstate Chemicals Clearinghouse. Allows authority to establish certain fees by rule. Allows authority to impose civil penalties. Allows authority to accept certain funding. Establishes High Priority Chemicals of Concern for Children's Health Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to authority. Specifies uses of moneys. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by authority. Becomes operative January 1, 2016. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to high priority chemicals of concern for children's health; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-06HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2015-03-09HouseReferred to Energy and Environment.
2015-03-02HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback