OR HB3468 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-27 - Chapter 751, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-27 - Chapter 751, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adds threatening to cause physical injury to animal to induce other person to engage in conduct as manner of committing crime of coercion. Requires court to order sentence of at least 10 days' imprisonment when person is convicted of crime of initiating a false report and response to false report involved deployment of SWAT team or similar group.
Title
Relating to crime.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-27 | House | Chapter 751, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016. |
2015-07-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-30 | House | Rules suspended. House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Greenlick. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Shields. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary, then Ways and Means. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Smith. |
2015-04-23 | House | Second reading. |
2015-04-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-04-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2015-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |