OR HB3439 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 179, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 179, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that in professional corporation that is organized to allow physicians, physician assistants and nurse practitioners to jointly render professional health care services, physicians, physician assistants or nurse practitioners must hold majority of voting shares and be majority of directors of professional corporation. Prohibits individual whom professional corporation employs, or individual who owns interest in professional corporation, from directing medical judgment of physician, physician assistant or nurse practitioner. Prohibits physician, physician assistant or nurse practitioner from directing services of another practitioner in professional corporation unless other practitioner also practices within same scope of practice as physician, physician assistant or nurse practitioner.
Title
Relating to professional corporations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 179, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Malstrom. Passed.Ayes, 53; Excused, 5--Alonso Leon, Boone, Gorsek, Kennemer, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Lively, Olson. |
2017-04-20 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-14 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-04-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |