OR HB3438 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-29 - Chapter 697, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-29 - Chapter 697, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permits City of Fairview to operate photo radar in school zone while school is in session.
Title
Relating to use of photo radar in school zones.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-29 | House | Chapter 697, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014. |
2013-07-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Senate adopted Conference Committee Report and repassed bill. Ayes, 18; nays, 11--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Starr, Whitsett; excused, 1--Thomsen. |
2013-06-27 | House | Repassed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Gelser, Kennemer, Thatcher, Weidner; Excused, 2--Barker, Smith. |
2013-06-27 | House | House adopted Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read in Senate. |
2013-06-26 | House | Conference Committee Recommendation: House concur in Senate amendments dated June 3, 2013 and bill be further amended and repassed. |
2013-06-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Senators Beyer, Girod, Monroe appointed Senate conferees. |
2013-06-21 | House | Representatives Read, Chair; Bentz, Gorsek appointed House conferees. |
2013-06-10 | House | House refused to concur in Senate amendments. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 19; nays, 11--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Hansell, Kruse, Olsen, Starr, Thomsen, Whitsett. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Judiciary be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation, then Judiciary. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-04-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 44; Nays, 16--Barton, Clem, Gelser, Gilliam, Hicks, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Matthews, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Weidner, Whitsett, Witt. |
2013-04-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 23, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-18 | House | Second reading. |
2013-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-04-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. |
2013-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |