OR HB3423 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-8)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 410, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-8)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 410, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts person serving in Oregon National Guard from requirement to enroll in community college courses within six months of attaining previous highest level of education in order to qualify for Oregon Promise grant, provided that person enrolls in community college courses within six months of completing initial active duty training. Exempts person serving in Oregon National Guard from requirement to enroll in community college courses within six months of attaining previous highest level of education in order to qualify for Oregon Promise grant, provided that person enrolls in community college courses within six months of completing initial active duty training.
Title
Relating to date to enroll in community college to qualify for the Oregon Promise.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | House | Chapter 410, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Carried over to 06-06 by unanimous consent. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 53; Excused, 6--Barker, Bynum, Heard, Kennemer, McLain, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-04-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 27, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-25 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development. |
2017-03-30 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |