OR HB3420 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to investigate possibility of receiving federal approval to implement copayments or other mechanisms to encourage medical assistance recipients to take personal responsibility for their own health and health care.
Title
Relating to medical assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |