OR HB3419 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits prosecuting attorney from conditioning plea offer on waiver of specified rights, eligibilities and legal challenges. Provides that prohibited provision in plea agreement is void and unenforceable.
Title
Relating to prohibited provisions in plea agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-19 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-19 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2019-04-04 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-03-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |