OR HB3415 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes requirements upon mental health treatment providers and programs to ensure culturally and linguistically appropriate care for individuals who are deaf, deaf-blind or hard of hearing. Imposes requirements upon mental health treatment providers and programs to ensure culturally and linguistically appropriate care for individuals who are deaf, deaf-blind or hard of hearing. Authorizes civil penalty for violation of requirements. Prohibits and designates as unlawful practice denial of access to culturally and linguistically affirmative mental health services based on residual hearing ability or previous experience in alternative mode of communication. Requires Oregon Health Authority to appoint Coordinator of Mental Health Services for Deaf, Deaf-Blind and Hard of Hearing Individuals and specifies duties.
Title
Relating to mental health services provided to individuals with impaired abilities to hear sounds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - House (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2017-04-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-03-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |