OR HB3414 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes retirement benefits payable under Oregon Public Service Retirement Plan to persons who establish membership in Public Employees Retirement System on or after effective date of Act. Provides that such persons do not become members of pension program of plan. Allows such persons to contribute up to 10 percent of salary to individual account program of plan. Requires employer match of contributions up to maximum of 10 percent of salary. Provides break in service and change in service rules for persons who established membership in system before effective date of Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to public employee retirement; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - House - House Rules suspended (Y: 28 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Rules (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Rules (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-03-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |