OR HB3412 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-10)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 722, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 15, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-10)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 722, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 15, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Assessments of Children Who Are Deaf or Hard of Hearing. Directs task force to submit report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to education no later than January 1, 2018. Sunsets task force on June 30, 2019. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to assessments for children with difficulties hearing; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Chapter 722, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 15, 2017. |
2017-08-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Made a Special Order of Business by voice vote. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-06-30 | House | Third reading as Special Order of Business. Carried by Sanchez. Passed.Ayes, 53; Excused, 2--Boone, Williamson; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Hernandez, Lively, Meek, Smith Warner, Whisnant. |
2017-06-29 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-06-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-22 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-22 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-06-20 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2017-04-20 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-17 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-03-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |