OR HB3411 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires reporting of physical sexual harassment by legislative officials and registered lobbyists. Specifies procedure for reporting. Punishes failure to report by maximum of $2,000 fine. Creates crime of false reporting of harassment. Punishes by maximum of 364 days' imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both. Creates crime of unlawful interference with a harassment investigation. Punishes by maximum of 364 days' imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both. Provides that public servant commits crime of official misconduct in the first degree if public servant knowingly harasses or annoys another person by subjecting other person to certain offensive physical contact. Punishes by maximum of 364 days' imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both.
Title
Relating to physical sexual harassment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 23 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-06-19 | House | Motion to withdraw from Judiciary failed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 36--Alonso Leon, Barker, Bynum, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lively, Marsh, McKeown, McLain, Meek, Mitchell, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Piluso, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Williams, Williamson, Witt; Excused, 1--Hernandez. |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-03-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |