OR HB3410 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Motion to withdraw from Revenue failed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 38--Alonso Leon, Barker, Bynum, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Hernandez, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lively, Marsh, McKeown, McLain, Meek, Mitchell, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith G, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Wilde, Williams, Williamson, Witt; Excused, 1--Piluso.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes personal income tax credit of $1,000 per qualifying child. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2020, and before January 1, 2026. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a child tax credit; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 21 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13HouseMotion to withdraw from Revenue failed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 38--Alonso Leon, Barker, Bynum, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Hernandez, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lively, Marsh, McKeown, McLain, Meek, Mitchell, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith G, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Wilde, Williams, Williamson, Witt; Excused, 1--Piluso.
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Revenue.
2019-03-27HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback