OR HB3408 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Environmental Quality for deposit in Residential Solid Fuel Heating Air Quality Improvement Fund to fund community efforts to promote economic development and improve public health by reducing emissions from solid fuel burning devices that burn wood. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Sen. Lynn Findley [R] | Sen. Floyd Prozanski [D] | Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] |
Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] | Rep. Joseph Zika [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-04 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2019-03-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |